CA AB2760 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 542, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 542, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8282 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utility contracting.
Title
Public utilities: contracting: women, minority, and disabled veteran business enterprises.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Bradford [D] | Asm. Susan Bonilla [D] | Asm. Joan Buchanan [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] |
Asm. Roger Hernandez [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Anthony Rendon [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2760 Committee on U. & C. (Bradford) By Hill (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AB 2760 U.& C. Assembly Third Reading By BRADFORD (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AB 2760 U.& C. Assembly Third Reading By BRADFORD (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 542, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4414.). |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2014-06-04 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4839.) |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4633.) |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 24. |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 8282 | Amended Code | Citation Text |