CA AB2741 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 344, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 344, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6510 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to the Professional Fiduciaries Bureau.
Title
Professional Fiduciaries Bureau.
Sponsors
Asm. Susan Bonilla [D] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2741 Bonilla By Lieu (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2741 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2741 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 344, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 4660.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 10. Page 5194.) |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2014-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 6510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |