CA AB2721 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-12 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-12 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 56510 of the Education Code, relating to special education.
Title
Special education disputes: report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-13 - Assembly - AB 2721 BLAKESLEE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-13 - Assembly - AB 2721 BLAKESLEE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-12 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-15 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-06-09 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-05-27 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-05-13 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-13 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5162.) | |
2010-05-10 | To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-05-04 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-03 | Withdrawn from committee. To second reading. | |
2010-04-28 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-27 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-26 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-04-08 | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |