CA AB272 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 37420.5 to the Government Code, and to amend Section 10061 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to water.
Title
Water utility service: sale of water utility property by a city.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (January 9). |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W.,P., & W. |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. |
2017-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 37420.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 10061 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 12893.50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 13000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |