CA AB272 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-05 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Padilla.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-05 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Padilla.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 15438 of, and to add Section 15438.10 to, the Government Code, relating to health facilities financing, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Health care facilities: financing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Assembly - AB 272 MONNING Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Assembly - AB 272 MONNING Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-05 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Padilla. | |
2012-01-25 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-01-24 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (January 19). | |
2012-01-17 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-01-13 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-01-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (January 11). | |
2012-01-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-08-30 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-04-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-04-14 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 982.) | |
2011-04-07 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-04-06 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 6). | |
2011-03-23 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-08 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-03-07 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-18 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-02-08 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To print. |