CA AB2718 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-15 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-15 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3160.5 to the Public Resources Code, relating to oil and gas.
Title
Oil and gas: well stimulation treatment: notification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2718 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2718 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and RLS. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5019.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3160.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |