CA AB2716 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-08 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-08 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 30525 and 30804.5 of the Food and Agricultural Code, and to amend Section 38792 of the Government Code, relating to dogs.
Title
Puppies: reduced licensing fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2716&sess=0910&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2716_bill_20100219_introduced.html |