CA AB2713 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12096.35 to the Government Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2713 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2713 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5018.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12096.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12096.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |