CA AB2706 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 12555) of Chapter 6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to justice.
Title
Innocence Commission Pilot Programs.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12555 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |