CA AB270 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 136.2 of the Penal Code, relating to restraining orders.
Title
Restraining orders: witness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 270 GALLAGHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 270 GALLAGHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2017-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1143.) |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 14). |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. |
2017-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 136.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |