CA AB270 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 393, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 393, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19522 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to satellite wagering.
Title
Satellite wagering.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Henry Perea [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-08 - Assembly - AB 270 PEREA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB270 Perea By Wright (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 270 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB270 Perea By Wright (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 270 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 393, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-08 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3127.). | |
2011-09-08 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2388.). | |
2011-09-06 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-09-02 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-06-20 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-15 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-06-14 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2011-05-19 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1456.) | |
2011-05-12 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1335.) | |
2011-04-04 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-03-31 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (March 30). | |
2011-02-18 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2011-02-08 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19522 | Amended Code | Citation Text |