CA AB2696 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 767, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 20480 of the Government Code, relating to public employee retirement, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Employees’ Retirement System: limited term appointments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2696 RODRIGUEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2696 Rodriguez By Pan (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - AB 2696 RODRIGUEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 767, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-26 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 13. Page 6982.).
2018-08-29AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 29).
2018-08-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 5567.).
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2018-04-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4827.)
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code20480Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22850Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback