CA AB2695 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 8 (commencing with Section 89270) to Chapter 2 of Part 55 of Division 8 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to the California State University.
Title
California State University: Cybersecurity Regional Alliances and Multistakeholder Partnerships Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and E.M. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 89270 | New Code | See Bill Text |