CA AB2693 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 618, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 618, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 53328.1 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 5898.15 of, to amend, renumber, and add Section 5898.16 of, and to add Section 5898.17 to, the Streets and Highways Code, relating to property improvements.
Title
Financing requirements: property improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2693 DABABNEH Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2693 Dababneh By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2693 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2693 Dababneh By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2693 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 618, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6457.). |
2016-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5346.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). |
2016-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4894.) |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on April 28 corrected. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 25). |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4448.) (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.) |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53313.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53328.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26054 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 167 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5898.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5898.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5898.28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5898.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |