CA AB2684 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 758, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 758, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6072 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 1033.5 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Civil actions: interpreter costs: indigent.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Roger Dickinson [D] | Asm. Mike Feuer [D] | Asm. Alyson Huber [D] |
Sen. William Monning [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2684 Committee on JUD. (Wieckowski) By Leno (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2684 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2684 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 758, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-29 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2012-08-29 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4953.). | |
2012-07-06 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-07-05 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). | |
2012-06-25 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-05-10 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-10 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 14. Page 4780.) | |
2012-05-09 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-08 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-05-07 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (May 1). | |
2012-03-19 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-03-13 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 12. | |
2012-03-12 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 6072 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1033.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |