CA AB268 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 130 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to court records.
Title
Courts: sealing records: autopsy reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 268 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-29 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 1626.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P. |
2021-01-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 15. |
2021-01-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |