CA AB2674 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12234 to the Government Code, relating to state archives.
Title
State archives: Online Archives Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Sen. Richard Roth [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12234 | New Code | See Bill Text |