CA AB2669 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - In committee: Referred to suspense file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - In committee: Referred to suspense file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 27567, 30114, and 30814 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Toll bridges: tolls.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2669 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2669 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2024-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (May 16). |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 27567 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 30114 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 30814 | New Code | See Bill Text |