CA AB2664 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 497, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 497, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 68086 and 70044 of the Government Code, relating to court reporters.
Title
Court reporters: official reporter pro tempore.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2664 Holden Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2664 Holden By Monning (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - AB 2664 HOLDEN Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2664 Holden By Monning (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - AB 2664 HOLDEN Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 497, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6122.). |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2018-06-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5042.) |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 68086 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 70044 | Amended Code | Citation Text |