CA AB2663 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 864, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 864, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22119.2, 22220, 22324, 22352, 22455, 22461, 22717, 22718, 23007, 23854, 24109, 24214, 24214.5, 24604, 25018, 25114, and 26812 of, and to repeal Sections 22218.5 and 24400 of, the Education Code, and to amend Section 6217.5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to teachers' retirement.
Title
Teachers' Retirement Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-28 - Assembly - AB 2663 P.E., R.& S.S. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By ALLEN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent #16 AB2663 Committee on P.E.,R.& S.S.(Allen) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2663 P.E., R.& S.S. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent #16 AB2663 Committee on P.E.,R.& S.S.(Allen) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2663 P.E., R.& S.S. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 864, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-28 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6428.). | |
2012-08-27 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.) | |
2012-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4784.). | |
2012-08-15 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-08-08 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-07 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 6). | |
2012-06-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-20 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2012-05-17 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-17 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4888.) | |
2012-05-10 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-05-09 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9). | |
2012-04-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2012-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2012-02-29 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 22119.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22218.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22324 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22352 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22455 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22461 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22717 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22718 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 23007 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 23854 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 24109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 24214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 24214.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 24400 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 24604 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 25018 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 25114 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 26812 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 6217.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |