CA AB266 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 689, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 689, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 27 and 101 of, to add Section 205.1 to, and to add Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 19300) to Division 8 of, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 9147.7 of the Government Code, to amend Section 11362.775 of the Health and Safety Code, to add Section 147.5 to the Labor Code, and to add Section 31020 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to medical marijuana.
Title
Medical marijuana.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Assembly - AB 266 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ( Supplemental File 3)AB 266 Bo nta By (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - AB 266 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ( Supplemental File 3)AB 266 Bo nta By (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - AB 266 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 689, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3194.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 14. Page 3208.). |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 24. Noes 3. Page 2737.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 23. Noes 8. Page 2743.) Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 8. Page 2744.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 2749.) Ord |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HEALTH. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and GOV. & F. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 8. Page 1923.) |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and L. & E. |
2015-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2015-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 205.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2220.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2242 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2264 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2525 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11552 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 23028 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 9147.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 111658 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11362.775 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1155.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1158.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 147.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 3094 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 31020 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 2402.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |