CA AB2651 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 437c, 660, 663a, and 2034.415 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Civil actions.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 2034.415 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 437 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 660 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 663 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 68086 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2651 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2651 |