CA AB265 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1178.5 to the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to tenancies.
Title
Tenancies: unlawful detainer.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died on inactive file. | |
2011-06-02 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Ammiano. | |
2011-05-04 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-03 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-02 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 26). | |
2011-04-12 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-04-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-05 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-15 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-02-18 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-02-08 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1178.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |