CA AB2649 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 757, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 757, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3.3 to the Burton Act (Chapter 1333 of the Statutes of 1968), relating to local government.
Title
Tidelands and submerged lands: City and County of San
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2649 AMMIANO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2649 Ammiano By Leno (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2649 AMMIANO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2649 Ammiano By Leno (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2649 AMMIANO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 757, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:40 p.m. | |
2012-08-29 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6517.). | |
2012-08-28 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-27 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4866.). | |
2012-08-22 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-21 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2012-05-25 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-25 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4986.) | |
2012-05-17 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-05-16 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16). | |
2012-05-03 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-02 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-05-01 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). | |
2012-04-23 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-04-19 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |