CA AB2641 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Communications and Conveyance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Communications and Conveyance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 286 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to telecommunications.
Title
California Emerging Technology Fund: focus and funding priorities.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 286 | New Code | See Bill Text |