CA AB264 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 136.2 of the Penal Code, relating to protective orders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protective orders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB264 Low et al. By Anderson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Assembly - AB 264 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-07-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-10SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-06-26SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-05-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1302.)
2017-04-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-28AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-03-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 21).
2017-03-14AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-03-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2017-02-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-02-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
2017-01-31AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code136.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback