CA AB263 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 66014.1 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: pilot program for free cost of education: working group.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2023-01-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 19. |
2023-01-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66014.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |