CA AB263 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 294, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 7321 to the Government Code, relating to private detention facilities, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private detention facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 263 Arambula Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent AB263 Arambula et al. By Durazo Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - AB 263 Arambula Third Reading Urgency (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-24 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 294, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-24 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-08 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2021-09-01AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.).
2021-09-01AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 16.)
2021-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2021-08-23SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-08-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-18SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-07-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6).
2021-06-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
2021-05-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-04-29AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1248.).
2021-04-15AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1029.)
2021-03-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-03-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 23).
2021-03-24AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-03-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-03-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-01-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 15.
2021-01-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code7321New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback