CA AB263 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (September 1). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1797.123 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Sections 226.9, 226.10, and 226.11 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency medical services workers: rights and working conditions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 263 RODRIGUEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (September 1). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-07-10SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 1979.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 26).
2017-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-04-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 19).
2017-03-28AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-03-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2017-03-08AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2017-02-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2017-02-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2017-02-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2017-02-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
2017-01-31AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1797.123New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code226.10New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code226.11New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code226.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code6401.9New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback