CA AB2626 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 945, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 8208, 8236, 8263, 8263.1, and 8275.5 of, and to add Sections 8236.2 and 8272.1 to, the Education Code, relating to child care services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child care services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2626 MULLIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent AB2626 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2626 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 945, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6803.).
2018-08-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5703.).
2018-08-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5633.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-25AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-05-25AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.)
2018-05-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-01AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25).
2018-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-04-12AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code8208Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8236Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8236.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code8263Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8263.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8272.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code8275.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback