CA AB2617 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 48070.7 to the Education Code, relating to dropout recovery programs.
Title
Dropout recovery programs: funding report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2012-05-09 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-24 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-23 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-19 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). | |
2012-03-19 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48070.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |