CA AB2607 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 211, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 211, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to tidelands and submerged lands, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tidelands and submerged lands: City and County of San Francisco: Port of San Francisco.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2607 Ting Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2607 Ting Third Reading Urgency (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2607 Ting Third Reading Urgency (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 211, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4682.). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4822.). |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4652.) |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 21). |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |