CA AB2606 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 332, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 14216 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal justice: supervised release file.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent AB2606 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2606 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 332, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-04AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2020-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2020-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2020-08-25SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
2020-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4797.)
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-03-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2020-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code14216Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback