CA AB2605 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 507, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 507, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 208, 4040.5, 4043, 4060, 4081, 4101, 4105, 4120, 4149, 4160, 4161, 4162, 4162.5, 4164, 4165, 4166, 4167, 4168, 4169, 4201, 4305.5, 4312, 4331, and 4400 of, to amend the heading of Article 11 (commencing with Section 4160) of Chapter 9 of Division 2 of, to add Sections 4022.7, 4044.5, 4053.1, 4107.5, and 4161.5 to, and to repeal and add Section 4045 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to pharmacy.
Title
Pharmacy: third-party logistics providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2605 BONILLA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2605 Bonilla By Corbett (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2605 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2605 Bonilla By Corbett (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2605 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 507, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6571.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 3. Page 6590.). |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4860.). |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 4). |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 5165.) |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |