CA AB2604 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 422.56 and 422.87 of the Penal Code, relating to hate crimes.
Title
Hate crimes.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 422.56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 422.87 | Amended Code | Citation Text |