CA AB260 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 547, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 547, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 52.6 of the Civil Code, relating to human trafficking.
Title
Human trafficking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Assembly - AB 260 SANTIAGO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent AB260 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - AB 260 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent AB260 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - AB 260 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 547, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2915.). |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2349.). |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2017-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 723.) |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 14). |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2017-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 52.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |