CA AB26 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 53069.63 to the Government Code, to add Part 5.5 (commencing with Section 1550) to Division 2 of the Labor Code, and to add Sections 653.65, 653.67, 653.69, 653.71, 653.73, and 653.74 to the Penal Code, relating to illegal immigrants.
Title
Illegal immigrants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2011-04-05 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | |
2011-03-22 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-03-15 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S. | |
2010-12-07 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 6. | |
2010-12-06 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53069.63 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 1550 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 653.65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 653.67 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 653.69 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 653.71 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 653.73 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 653.74 | New Code | See Bill Text |