CA AB2598 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 37222.19 to the Education Code, and to add Section 6726 to the Government Code, relating to public schools.
Title
Lunar New Year's Day.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Edwin Chau [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Das Williams [D] | Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 2598 TING Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and G.O. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4596.) |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 37222.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 6726 | New Code | See Bill Text |