CA AB2592 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-27 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-27 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19104.5 and 19116 of the Education Code, relating to libraries.
Title
County free public libraries: withdrawal: use of private
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-06 - Senate - Special Consent #15 AB2592 Furutani (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2592 FURUTANI Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2592 FURUTANI Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). | |
2012-08-24 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-06 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | |
2012-08-06 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-07-06 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4321.). | |
2012-07-05 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-07-03 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-07-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-06-20 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-19 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-05-10 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-10 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4787.) | |
2012-05-03 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-05-02 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2). | |
2012-04-19 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 19104.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 19116 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 33533 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 33534 | Amended Code | Citation Text |