CA AB2591 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 617, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 617, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and amend Section 1633.3 of the Civil Code, and to amend and add Section 38.6 of, and to repeal Section 38.5 of, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: electronic transmission.
Sponsors
Asm. Matt Dababneh [D] | Asm. Travis Allen [R] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D] |
Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2591 DABABNEH Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2591 Dababneh By Hall (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2591 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2591 Dababneh By Hall (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2591 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 617, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6397.). |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5130.). |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5011.) |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4948.) |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1633.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 38.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 38.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |