CA AB2588 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14670.17 to the Government Code, relating to state surplus property, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
State surplus property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-04-11 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-29 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-03-28 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-19 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14670.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |