CA AB258 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 51, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 7151.36 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to organ transplants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Organ transplants: medical marijuana: qualified patients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB258 Levine By Leno (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 258 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 51, Statutes of 2015.
2015-07-06 Approved by the Governor.
2015-06-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
2015-06-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2015-06-22SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 1545.).
2015-06-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10).
2015-05-14SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2015-04-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-04-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 12. Page 1214.)
2015-04-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (April 7).
2015-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2015-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2015-02-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2015-02-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
2015-02-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code7151.36New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_258&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0251-0300/ab_258_bill_20150209_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0251-0300/ab_258_bill_20150325_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0251-0300/ab_258_bill_20150624_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0251-0300/ab_258_bill_20150706_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0251-0300/ab_258_vote_20150407_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0251-0300/ab_258_vote_20150430_0911AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0251-0300/ab_258_vote_20150610_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0251-0300/ab_258_vote_20150622_0344PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback