CA AB258 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 227, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 227, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11019.11 to the Government Code, relating to state agencies.
Title
State agencies: veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB258 Ch (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - AB 258 CHAVEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - AB 258 CHAVEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 227, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1882.). |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1155.) |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 17). |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2013-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11019.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |