CA AB258 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 542, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 542, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 121690 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to rabies.
Title
Rabies: vaccinations.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Beth Gaines [R] | Asm. Martin Garrick [R] | Asm. Curt Hagman [R] |
Asm. Linda Halderman [R] | Asm. Allan Mansoor [R] | Asm. Henry Perea [D] | Asm. Cameron Smyth [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-06 - Assembly - AB 258 HAGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB258 Hagman By Leno (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 258 HAGMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB258 Hagman By Leno (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 258 HAGMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 542, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2011-09-06 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2905.). | |
2011-09-01 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2190.). | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25). | |
2011-07-11 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-20 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-16 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). | |
2011-05-26 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-05-12 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1356.) | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-07 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-02-18 | Referred to Com. on AGRI. | |
2011-02-08 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 121690 | Amended Code | Citation Text |