CA AB2579 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 12694 of the Insurance Code, and to add Section 14124.16 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: California Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children.
Sponsors
Asm. Autumn Burke [D] | Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] |
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2579 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2579 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 5479.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 25). |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.) |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 12694 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14087.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14124.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14124.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |