CA AB2577 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 42652.5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Organic waste: reduction regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42652.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |