CA AB2577 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 148, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 148, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8042 to the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: uniform filing forms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-01 - Assembly - AB 2577 Bigelow Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2577 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2577 Bigelow Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2577 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2577 Bigelow Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 148, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-04 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5707.). |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4575.). |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4882.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 8042 | New Code | See Bill Text |