CA AB2568 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 393, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 393, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 26261 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.
Title
Cannabis: insurance providers.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2568 Cooley By Dodd (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Assembly - AB 2568 Cooley Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Assembly - AB 2568 Cooley Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 393, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5120.). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2022-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and INS. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4521.) |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on INS. and B. & P. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26261 | New Code | See Bill Text |