CA AB2567 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 103, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 103, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 53756 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Sewer collection agency: schedule of fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Assembly - AB 2567 CARTER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Special Consent #13 AB2567 Carter (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2567 CARTER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Special Consent #13 AB2567 Carter (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2567 CARTER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 103, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-07-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2012-06-28 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5523.). | |
2012-06-25 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-06-25 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4058.). | |
2012-06-20 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-06-18 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-15 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13). | |
2012-05-31 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-05-21 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-21 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 4914.) | |
2012-05-14 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-10 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 9). | |
2012-03-27 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-03-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-19 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53756 | Amended Code | Citation Text |