CA AB2561 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65913.4 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Planning and zoning: housing: streamlined, ministerial approval: Benicia Arsenal Historic District.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65913.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |